U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00227-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HAMDAOUI
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Arrest ]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • July 01, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • July 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • July 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 01, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 17, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 17, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • May 17, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • May 13, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Protective Order ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 22, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • February 22, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 22, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 22, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.