U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KROL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • March 30, 2022: [Exclude]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 18, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 23, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.