U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BARTLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 04, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Modify]
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Probation Order]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.