U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HENEGHAN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 13, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • November 13, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • November 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • November 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 13, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • November 10, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • October 27, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [.Order]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [.Order]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 11, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 11, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 09, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 04, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 04, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • February 25, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.