U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GILLESPIE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Verdict Form ]
  • December 23, 2022: [Signature of Foreperson..... (STAYS SEALED)]
  • December 23, 2022: [Jury Notes ]
  • December 23, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 23, 2022: [~Util- Jury Verdict]
  • December 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 22, 2022: [Signature of Foreperson..... (STAYS SEALED)]
  • December 22, 2022: [Jury Notes ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Attorneys' Acknowledgment of Trial Exhibits]
  • December 22, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • December 19, 2022: [Minute Order for Jury Meals]
  • December 19, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • December 18, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Witness List]
  • December 15, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
  • December 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 02, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • November 29, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Change of Venue]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • November 23, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • November 21, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • November 14, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • November 10, 2022: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • November 04, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • November 04, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • November 03, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [Status Report]
  • July 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [.Order]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Add Counts]
  • May 06, 2022: [Indictment]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 02, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 02, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 25, 2022: [Indictment]
  • February 25, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 25, 2022: [Protective Order ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.