U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CARTER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • March 08, 2022: [Travel ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • March 02, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 02, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 02, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 28, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 28, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • February 28, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.