U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BROWN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 04, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • August 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • June 09, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • June 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • June 09, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 10, 2022: [.Order]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Exclude]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 01, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 01, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • March 01, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Arrest ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 28, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.