U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GENCO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • December 01, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • September 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 19, 2022: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • September 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • June 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 29, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • June 29, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • June 24, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • June 19, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 02, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 28, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • February 28, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 28, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Proposed Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.