U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. EVANS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Transcript]
  • January 20, 2023: [Transcript]
  • January 17, 2023: [Transcript]
  • January 12, 2023: [Transcript]
  • January 11, 2023: [Transcript]
  • January 09, 2023: [Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Transcript]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 21, 2022: [Signature of Foreperson..... (STAYS SEALED)]
  • November 21, 2022: [Jury Notes ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Verdict Form ]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util- Jury Verdict]
  • November 21, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Attorneys' Acknowledgment of Trial Exhibits]
  • November 17, 2022: [Acquittal ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • November 16, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • November 16, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Travel ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • November 10, 2022: [Jury Selection - Do Not Use If Jurors Sworn/Trial Began]
  • November 10, 2022: [Minute Order for Jury Meals]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • November 08, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Document]
  • August 19, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • August 18, 2022: [Attorney Appearance Pro Bono]
  • August 17, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • August 17, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 12, 2022: [Transcript]
  • August 12, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • August 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 05, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • August 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 29, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 22, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 15, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • July 13, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Response to motion]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • June 30, 2022: [404(b) Evidence]
  • June 29, 2022: [Exclude]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Suppress]
  • June 10, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Document]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Document]
  • April 07, 2022: [Status Conference]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 10, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 10, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 01, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Indictment]
  • February 28, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 28, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.