U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00040
  • Case Name: ENFORCEMENT OF A RESTRAINING ORDER FROM HONDURAS TO RESTRAIN THE FOLLOWING PROPERTIES AT JP MORGAN CHASE & CO.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Reply to opposition to motion]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 02, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 04, 2022: [Strike]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 19, 2022: [.Order]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Claim]
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.