U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SHOUGH
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Errata]
  • March 14, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Errata]
  • March 10, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 08, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Errata]
  • March 07, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 07, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 01, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 01, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.