U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00021
  • Case Name: IN RE: SEALED MOTION
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 04, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Sealed Reply]
  • March 04, 2022: [Sealed Opposition]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 01, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 01, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.