U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. THOMAS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 26, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 31, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • May 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 06, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Exclude]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Exclude]
  • April 10, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 20, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 11, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • March 11, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • March 11, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 08, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • March 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 07, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 07, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.