U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00022
  • Case Name: MARGOLIS et al v. CECIL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of QC]
  • June 13, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • June 10, 2022: [Status Report]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [.Order]
March, 2022
  • March 06, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 02, 2022: [Quash]
  • March 02, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.