U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00026
  • Case Name: THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA TO BRENDAN FISCHER et al v. SENATE MAJORITY PAC
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • March 23, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 18, 2022: [Surreply]
  • March 18, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 16, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • March 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 11, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 11, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 10, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 10, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 04, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 03, 2022: [Stay]
  • March 03, 2022: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.