U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CRUZ, JR
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 13, 2023: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 13, 2023: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • January 13, 2023: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • January 13, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 11, 2023: [Trial Brief ]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 12, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 09, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 11, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • November 11, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • November 11, 2022: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • November 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 17, 2022: [Errata]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • October 17, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 13, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • October 05, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • October 01, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • September 30, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • September 01, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
August, 2022
  • August 27, 2022: [Suppress]
  • August 27, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • August 23, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 23, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • August 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
  • August 05, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 05, 2022: [.Order]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 06, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 29, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 18, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • March 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 04, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 04, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 04, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 04, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.