U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00027
  • Case Name: In Re SUBPOENA SERVED ON DONALD J. TRUMP
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • October 28, 2022: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • October 28, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Document]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Supplemental Memorandum]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Discovery Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • June 21, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • June 15, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • June 15, 2022: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of QC]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 06, 2022: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 11, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • March 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
  • March 09, 2022: [Sealed Opposition]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • March 08, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 08, 2022: [Declaration]
  • March 08, 2022: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • March 08, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.