U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CELENTANO, III
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • May 17, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 17, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 25, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 24, 2022: [Status Report]
  • March 22, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 21, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 16, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Location Start]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 09, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 09, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.