U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JARRIN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • May 03, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 09, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 09, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.