U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CANTRELL et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 16, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Location Start]
  • March 16, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 10, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 10, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 09, 2022: [.Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.