U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. STALLANS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Convert Hearing]
  • May 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2022: [Convert Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2022: [Exclude]
  • April 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 01, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
March, 2022
  • March 26, 2022: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • March 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • March 17, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 14, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 11, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.