U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ZERKLE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 17, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 17, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 16, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.