U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GOULD
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • September 16, 2022: [Convert Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • July 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Exclude]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Status Report]
  • May 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Exclude]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Status Conference]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 15, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 15, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.