U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KASPER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • April 28, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 25, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 25, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 17, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 17, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.