U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00031
  • Case Name: MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA DIRECTED TO NON- PARTIES JOEL MOWBRAY AND ROBIN ROSENZWEIG
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 24, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.