U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BARCLIFT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • December 14, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 14, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • December 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • October 18, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 22, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 22, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 31, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 31, 2022: [Transcript]
  • March 30, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • March 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 30, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 29, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 29, 2022: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court - Magistrate Judge Case]
  • March 29, 2022: [Standing Order]
  • March 28, 2022: [Status Report]
  • March 28, 2022: [Bond ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 28, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • March 25, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 25, 2022: [Stay]
  • March 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 25, 2022: [~Util - Medical/Mental Health Alert]
  • March 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 25, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • March 25, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 25, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 23, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.