U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MUNGER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 24, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.