U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 17, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • November 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 06, 2022: [.Order]
July, 2022
  • July 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 23, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 01, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 29, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 29, 2022: [Standing Order]
  • March 24, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 24, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.