U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ZERKLE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Exclude]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • July 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 03, 2022: [Exclude]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [.Order]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 12, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 08, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 08, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Protective Order ]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 25, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.