U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FOREMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 13, 2022: [Factual Proffer]
  • October 13, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 11, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • October 07, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • October 05, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • October 05, 2022: [Bill of Particulars ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Indictment]
  • September 28, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • June 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 06, 2022: [Suppress]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [404(b) Evidence]
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • April 15, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 30, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • March 30, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • March 30, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Exclude]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 29, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 29, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 25, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.