U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MARBLEY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Status Report]
  • January 18, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Indictment]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Protective Order ]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 28, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • March 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • March 25, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • March 25, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 25, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • March 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.