U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LAMMONS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 10, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • November 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 08, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • November 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • November 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • October 12, 2022: [Exclude]
  • October 12, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 28, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [.Order]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 06, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 06, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 01, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 28, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.