U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. THOMAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [.Order]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 27, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • April 27, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 27, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • April 27, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • April 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 27, 2022: [Deferred of PSI Report]
  • April 27, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 28, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.