U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ARCHER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 22, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Convert Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 24, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 24, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 24, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 24, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 24, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • May 09, 2022: [Status Conference]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 26, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 04, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 04, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 31, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 28, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.