U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JONES et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • May 10, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order]
  • May 09, 2022: [Protective Order ]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 29, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 29, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 29, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.