U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MAXWELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 23, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 22, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 25, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • March 31, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 30, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.