U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00096-2
  • Case Name: USA v. HANDY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2025
  • March 03, 2025: [.Order]
January, 2025
  • January 25, 2025: [Dismiss Case]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • January 17, 2023: [Travel ]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • November 22, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • November 21, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • November 11, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • November 04, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 04, 2022: [Response to motion]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 31, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 25, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 24, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 24, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 21, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 21, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order for Routine Processing]
  • October 17, 2022: [Indictment]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • September 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 25, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 27, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • May 17, 2022: [Appear]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 09, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • May 09, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 06, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • May 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 28, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 27, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 26, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 13, 2022: [Attorney Appearance Pro Bono]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 12, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 08, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 07, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 07, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 31, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 31, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 31, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 30, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 30, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 30, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.