U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CLAYTON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 10, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • April 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • April 10, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 31, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.