U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PRICE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 14, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 14, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 23, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 23, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 23, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 23, 2022: [Appear]
  • June 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 10, 2022: [.Order]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.