U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KROL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Exclude]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Exclude]
  • November 15, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • October 17, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • October 09, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • October 06, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • September 15, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 05, 2022: [Exclude]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • July 06, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 16, 2022: [Arraignment]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • April 26, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 26, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 26, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 26, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 31, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 31, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.