U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00109-4
  • Case Name: USA v. OTIS-CURRIE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 09, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • December 09, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • December 09, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Status Conference]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 12, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • April 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.