U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RHEINER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • November 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • November 04, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • October 18, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Criminal History Report]
  • August 30, 2022: [Criminal History Report]
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Status Conference]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 18, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 18, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 01, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.