U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HAND et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Filing Trial Exhibits Introduced Into Evidence]
  • January 18, 2023: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • January 18, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 13, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • January 11, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Courtroom Change]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • December 23, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • December 22, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 14, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 18, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 11, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • May 10, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • May 08, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • May 08, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 05, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 04, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [.Order]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.