U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00039
  • Case Name: MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA DIRECTED TO NON-PARTY IPI PARTNERS, LLC
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • April 07, 2022: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 31, 2022: [Motion to Compel (Initiating)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.