U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CAPSEL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • December 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 19, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Filing Trial Exhibits Introduced Into Evidence]
  • December 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 01, 2022: [.Order]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 09, 2022: [Factual Proffer]
  • September 09, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • September 09, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 07, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • August 10, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Criminal History Report]
  • May 09, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Criminal History Report]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 12, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 31, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 31, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.