U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DHAVALE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • September 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 21, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • September 21, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 21, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • September 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • September 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Exclude]
  • June 15, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • April 19, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 19, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 12, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 05, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.