U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BROWN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 07, 2022: [Factual Proffer]
  • October 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 07, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Status Report]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 08, 2022: [Exclude]
  • September 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 11, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 26, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 26, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • April 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • April 15, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • April 13, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 12, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • April 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 06, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 06, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.