U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CAMERO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Hearing ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 23, 2023: [Status Report]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Courtroom Change]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Exclude]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Permit]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Medical Exam ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Permit]
  • May 16, 2022: [Medical Exam ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • May 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Status Conference]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.