U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MAZZIO, JR
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 13, 2022: [Statement of Facts in Support of Plea Agreement ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 13, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • April 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 12, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • April 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 04, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.