U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HAZARD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Status Report]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Status Report]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • July 06, 2022: [Exclude]
  • July 06, 2022: [Status Report]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Location Start]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 20, 2022: [Status Conference]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 11, 2022: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 11, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • April 11, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 05, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.